FAITH IN FAMILIES

Charity number: 213692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sanjeev Kumar Trustee 21 June 2016 None on record
Haidee Watson Trustee 02 July 2018 None on record
PATRICK ADIE Trustee 10 March 2015 None on record
EDWARD HAYES Trustee 10 September 2012 None on record
John Bale Trustee None on record
DEREK HUETT Trustee 04 July 2017 None on record
MARGARET STAPLES Trustee 11 May 2012 None on record