Financial history PARISH ESTATES CHARITY

Charity number: 213721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £21.90k £23.48k £27.48k £16.19k £21.80k
Total expenditure £28.25k £18.66k £24.97k £19.74k £24.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A