Financial history THE PRISONERS OF CONSCIENCE APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 213766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £284.25k £342.52k £331.90k £275.82k £340.56k
Total expenditure £289.84k £365.11k £328.73k £289.25k £317.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £7.57k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k N/A