ST MICHAEL'S LODGE NO 211 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 213823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.16k £1.68k £1.31k £955 £872
Total expenditure £1.50k £2.00k £1.00k £500 £2.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A