THE MARY CURZON CHARITY FOR WOMEN WORKERS COMMONLY KNOWN AS THE MARY CURZON HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 213841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £505 £508 £382 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A