Financial history THE SAVE THE CHILDREN FUND

Charity number: 213890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £406.56m £303.20m £307.37m £288.73m £240.41m
Total expenditure £408.06m £314.61m £308.90m £283.16m £235.93m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £139.24m £85.90m £68.85m £65.07m £40.50m
Income - Donations and legacies £109.06m £91.81m £89.21m £88.44m £84.41m
Income - Other trading activities £12.58m £13.23m £13.45m £6.59m £7.06m
Income - Charitable activities £280.98m £194.22m £200.34m £188.92m £144.99m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £865.00k £879.00k £1.07m £760.00k £496.00k
Income - Other £3.07m £3.06m £3.30m £4.02m £3.44m
Income - Legacies £21.01m £22.23m £24.16m £17.33m £19.38m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £370.53m £276.07m £270.63m £252.12m £202.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £38.05m £37.36m £35.97m £28.58m £30.94m
Expenditure - Governance £1.16m £863.00k £1.13m £1.08m £1.32m
Expenditure - Grants institution £282.13m £191.97m £191.41m £187.78m £139.41m
Expenditure - Investment management £180.00k £102.00k £120.00k £93.00k £145.00k
Expenditure - Other -£512.00k £1.18m £2.30m £2.46m £2.44m