Governance THE SAVE THE CHILDREN FUND

Charity number: 213890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 10 October 1962: Standard registration
  • 10 May 2017: Funds received from 1117672 SUNSHINE PROJECT
  • 17 December 2020: Funds received from 253002 MISS M L WATTS CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT OTHERWISE KNO...
  • 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1143457 THE LYCETT HUMANITARIAN TRUST
  • 12 May 2021: Funds received from 228545 ROYAL ANTEDILUVIAN ORDER OF BUFFALOES GRAND COUNCI...
  • 22 July 2021: Funds received from 276844 MISS S M G ROSS TRUST
  • 28 January 2022: Funds received from 1150362 STEPCHANGE FOUNDATION UK
  • 25 October 2022: Funds received from 1171801 BLESSED TO REACHOUT
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • SAVE THE CHILDREN (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property