Accounts and annual returns ST PETER'S WALWORTH SICK AND POOR FUND

Charity number: 213966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required