Financial history ST PETER'S WALWORTH SICK AND POOR FUND

Charity number: 213966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £216 £221 £225 £230
Total expenditure £0 £51 £253 £41 £141
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A