TOWN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 214060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 01 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 01 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 20 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 10 July 2018 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 20 June 2018 174 days late Download