KENFIG CORPORATION TRUST

Charity number: 214084
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 February 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 19 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 19 February 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 19 February 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2017 19 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 19 February 2016 23 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 February 2016 04 October 2016 On time Download