Financial history KENFIG CORPORATION TRUST

Charity number: 214084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/02/2018 19/02/2019 19/02/2020 19/02/2021 19/02/2022
Total gross income £83.59k £85.45k £75.83k £135.78k £104.20k
Total expenditure £35.76k £41.73k £145.80k £69.41k £197.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A