Trustees KENFIG CORPORATION TRUST
Charity number: 214084

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN DAVIES | Chair | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY DAVID NUTTGENS | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Theresa Stapleton | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Lock | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Marks | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Bonham | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER ANTHONY JOHN | Trustee | 14 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Martin | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Douglas Walker | Trustee | 10 September 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.