Accounts and annual returns ST MARGARET'S BELL RINGING TRUST

Charity number: 214085
Charity reporting is overdue by 1800 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 339 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 339 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 704 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 704 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1070 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1070 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1435 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1435 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1800 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1800 days