FRANCO-BRITISH SOCIETY

Charity number: 214096
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 09 February 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 09 February 2021 71 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 12 February 2020 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 12 February 2020 74 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 07 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 02 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 10 November 2016 On time Download