FRANCO-BRITISH SOCIETY

Charity number: 214096
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £38.48k £37.39k £50.32k £76.90k £76.90k
Total expenditure £46.42k £45.82k £41.66k £48.86k £46.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A