ST PETER'S COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 214164
Charity reporting is up to date (198 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 August 2021 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 August 2021 198 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 May 2021 482 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 27 May 2021 482 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 August 2019 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 August 2019 182 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 April 2018 69 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 April 2018 69 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 10 April 2018 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 10 April 2018 434 days late Download