MERCHANT TAYLORS' CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 214267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £74.34k £76.81k £83.22k £90.13k £813.65k
Total expenditure £99.30k £189.82k £64.88k £54.37k £460.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £76.44k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £326.69k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £410.53k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £412.56k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £48.27k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £63.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £349.44k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £48.27k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0