THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL

Charity number: 214364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 July 2019 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 July 2019 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download