THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL

Charity number: 214364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £16.30m £12.37m £12.72m £13.09m £12.36m
Total expenditure £10.56m £14.86m £12.67m £13.75m £11.97m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.13m £3.95m N/A £5.05m £1.13m
Income - Donations and legacies £8.48m £4.02m £4.01m £3.88m £3.94m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.79m £8.32m £8.67m £9.15m £7.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £7.00k £32.00k £39.00k £68.00k £579.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £388.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.37m £14.66m £12.39m £13.44m £11.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £186.00k £207.00k £284.00k £317.00k £293.00k
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £32.00k £30.00k £65.00k £28.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £3.12m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0