THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To train and educate outstanding classical ballet dancers for The Royal Ballet, Birmingham Royal Ballet and other top international dance companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£21,241,000
Donations and legacies | £11.49m | |
Charitable activities | £9.56m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £199.00k |
Total expenditure:
£16,191,000
Raising funds | £710.00k | |
Charitable activities | £15.48m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,634,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £710.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.48m | |
Retained for future use | £5.05m |
People

255 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 8 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 1962: Standard registration
- ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Kaplinsky | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Alistair Summers | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Edward Watson | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Lady Sarah Ann Dorfman | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Anne Davis | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Mary Breen | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Dennen | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Cordelia Redwood-Sawyerr | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Suzanne Margaret Brennan | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Ebstein | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Craig Alan Ranson | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Carlos Acosta CBE | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Kathryn Wijeratna | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas Clementi | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Joanna Birkett | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Ms Zita Saurel | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Kevin O'Hare | Trustee | 12 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.09m | £12.36m | £11.77m | £12.53m | £21.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75m | £11.97m | £12.89m | £14.28m | £16.19m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.05m | £1.13m | £4.81m | £4.93m | £4.63m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.88m | £3.94m | £3.36m | £3.25m | £11.49m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.15m | £7.84m | £8.29m | £9.23m | £9.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £68.00k | £579.00k | £120.00k | £60.00k | £199.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £13.44m | £11.68m | £12.54m | £13.76m | £15.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £317.00k | £293.00k | £350.00k | £520.00k | £710.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £65.00k | £28.00k | £49.00k | £18.00k | £28.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £39.48m | £38.55m | £37.66m | £37.09m | £36.33m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £7.54m | £7.56m | £7.77m | £5.94m | £13.52m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.31m | -£1.30m | -£1.17m | -£59.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.87m | £1.59m | £2.06m | £1.44m | £3.26m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST MARCH 1955 AS AMENDED ON THE 20TH FEBRUARY 1957, 16TH OCTOBER 1957, 31ST AUGUST 1959, 24TH OCTOBER 1962, 1ST MARCH 1972 AND 9 JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
THE PRIMARY OBJECT IS TO CONDUCT AND MAINTAIN THE SCHOOL IN ALL RESPECTS AS A CHARITY, AND TO APPLY THE PROPERTY AND INCOME OF THE SCHOOL FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY. FURTHER OBJECTS ARE (I) TO CONDUCT A SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS IN THE BALLET, AND FOR PROVIDING SCHOLASTIC EDUCATION FOR SUCH OF THE SAID BOYS AND GIRLS AS ARE BY LAW REQUIRED TO RECEIVE SUCH EDUCATION; (II) TO RECEIVE, EDUCATE AND TRAIN STUDENTS IN BALLET, DRAMA, DANCING, SINGING, MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL
46 FLORAL STREET
LONDON
WC2E 9DA
- Phone:
- 02078368899
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window