THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL

Charity number: 214364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MICHAEL STEPHEN SPURR Trustee 10 June 2014
TONBRIDGE SCHOOL Received: On time
Tom Clementi Trustee 31 October 2018
ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
Nishi Somaiya Grose Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
Ms Zita Saurel Trustee 04 November 2015
ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
J. EDWARD CONWAY FUND Received: On time
Carlos Acosta CBE Trustee 17 June 2020
THE FREDERICK ASHTON FOUNDATION Received: On time
Justin Albert Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Craig Alan Ranson Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Joanna Birkett Trustee 31 October 2018 None on record
KENNETH STEELE Trustee 25 June 2013
J. EDWARD CONWAY FUND Received: On time
JANET LAMBERT Trustee None on record
Christopher Rodrigues Chair 26 November 2019
FROGNAL EDUCATIONAL CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE SCHOOL Received: On time
Kevin O'Hare Trustee 12 November 2012
NORTHERN BALLET LIMITED Received: On time
Susan Kathryn Wijeratna Trustee 26 November 2019 None on record
Menna McGregor Trustee 27 February 2013
ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
J. EDWARD CONWAY FUND Received: On time
THE YORK EARLY MUSIC FOUNDATION Received: On time
Suzanne Margaret Brennan Trustee 23 July 2021 None on record
David Ebstein Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
DAVID FLETCHER Trustee 24 June 2011 None on record