OBSERVER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 214491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making donations to charities to further their objectives

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER HARRISON Chair
BRITISH CARDIAC RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
Tanya Shillingford Trustee 02 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £2.50k £500 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.00k £2.50k £500 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 13 February 2025 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 August 2024 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 August 2024 562 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ITCHEN STOKE MILL
OVINGTON
ALRESFORD
SO24 0RA
Phone:
01962732761
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available