SCOPE FOR BOSTON AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 214710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.37k £7.31k £6.98k £6.39k £1.96k
Total expenditure £9.46k £6.79k £10.49k £10.41k £3.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A