HUGUENOT SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 214726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time Download