HUGUENOT SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity number: 214726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
S B de Save Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
GLYNDA DAWN EASTERBROOK Trustee 12 August 2011
THE FRENCH HUGUENOT CHURCH OF LONDON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Myrna Jeannette Hayter Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
MARTIN FREDERIC HARCOURT WILLIAMS Trustee
THE FRENCH HUGUENOT CHURCH OF LONDON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
LESLIE JOHN DU CANE Trustee 10 May 2019
HUGUENOT HERITAGE CENTRE Received: On time
THE FRENCH HOSPITAL Received: On time
DR Diane Elizabeth Irene Watts PhD, MA Trustee 26 May 2018 None on record
Joyce Hampton Trustee 26 May 2018
STAIRWAY TO HEAVEN MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
Peter John Craggs Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Stanley Rondeau Trustee 10 May 2019
HIGHLANDS VILLAGE HALL MANNAGEMENT ASSOCIATION LTD Received: On time
ANNE ELIZABETH NUGENT Trustee None on record
Katrina Matthews Trustee 10 May 2019 None on record
Keith Andrew Finch Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
ANTHONY WILSON Trustee
THE FRENCH HUGUENOT CHURCH OF LONDON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Barbara Margaret Julien BA Chair 10 May 2019 None on record
Antoinette Sarah Giraud Vermont Trustee 31 May 2020 None on record
Sara Haw MBA FRSA Trustee 10 May 2019 None on record