Financial history THE SALVATION ARMY

Charity number: 214779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £209.66m £231.37m £237.52m £240.61m £237.79m
Total expenditure £186.30m £196.78m £233.42m £235.52m £199.22m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.61m £1.29m £1.52m £1.50m £12.30m
Income - Donations and legacies £126.42m £135.77m £134.17m £130.19m £144.56m
Income - Other trading activities £73.68m £79.37m £88.24m £91.20m £58.56m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £8.90m £9.61m £13.20m £30.61m
Income - Endowments £190.00k £195.00k £206.00k £215.00k £225.00k
Income - Investment £4.08m £5.78m £4.59m £5.22m £2.85m
Income - Other £5.49m £1.55m £1.13m £1.02m £1.44m
Income - Legacies £50.48m £63.64m £60.29m £52.97m £48.39m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £114.23m £119.04m £148.54m £141.44m £116.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £72.07m £77.74m £84.89m £94.08m £82.26m
Expenditure - Governance £496.00k £551.00k £684.00k £662.00k £573.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0