Governance THE SALVATION ARMY

Charity number: 214779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 15 February 1963: Standard registration
  • 29 March 2014: Funds received from 209418 MISS ELIZABETH SIMPKINS TRUST
  • 06 April 2016: Funds received from 1071437 NATIONAL UNITED TEMPERANCE COUNCIL
  • 23 March 2017: Funds received from 273778 LITTLEPORT DAY CENTRE APPEAL FUND
  • 10 January 2019: Funds received from 517112 THE JACK GOLDBERG CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 08 February 2019: Funds received from 1048881 FRIDAY CIRCLE CLUB OF BRAINTREE
  • 28 June 2019: Funds received from 1010956 MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL SOCIAL HELP
  • 02 July 2019: Funds received from 702610 THE LINCOLN SPIRITUAL ASSOCIATION
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
  • 02 March 2021: Funds received from 1151693 7 PROJECT
  • 01 April 2021: Funds received from 293585 THE WOODFORD WELLS ECUMENICAL CHURCH TRUST
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 1003538 THE RAYMOND COLMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 12 July 2021: Funds received from 1137384 THE WORD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CENTRE (UK)
  • 07 September 2021: Funds received from 1138196 ELSECAR WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH
  • 27 October 2021: Funds received from 1167793 THE LILY TRUST
  • 17 November 2021: Funds received from 1166717 CHIPPENHAM STREET PASTORS
  • 07 March 2022: Funds received from 224117 ASHTON-IN-MAKERFIELD OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTE...
  • 26 May 2022: Funds received from 238037 BETHANIA BAPTIST CHAPEL - TRUST FUNDS AND PROPERTY...
  • 24 June 2022: Funds received from 1106188 SOUTH MONTGOMERYSHIRE VOLUNTEER BUREAU LIMITED
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property