THOMAS MONKE

Charity number: 214783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.02k £4.27k £4.69k £4.57k £3.84k
Total expenditure £3.30k £4.77k £3.45k £5.95k £4.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A