THOMAS MONKE

Charity number: 214783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES FREDERICK WOLLASTON Chair 04 May 2000
SPENCE'S PENSION CHARITY FOR MARKET BOSWORTH Received: On time
JEAN KIRKHOPE ANGUS Trustee 22 April 2008
VALUES EDUCATION FOR LIFE CIO Overdue by 35 days
Carole Ann Baker Trustee 26 April 2019 None on record
SALLY ANNE WOLLASTON Trustee 10 May 2012 None on record
DAWN ROACH Trustee 25 April 2006 None on record