C F LUNOE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 214850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £83.92k £87.51k £91.52k £96.72k £95.53k
Total expenditure £92.07k £83.92k £98.91k £92.91k £91.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A