HENRY SMITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support the poor and needy in Little Bookham, usually around 8 individuals, with vouchers to be used in a local shop. Occasionally we make a grant to an individual for a specific reason.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 May 1963: Standard registration
- 15 August 2017: Funds received from 289548 THE EQUITABLE CHARITABLE TRUST
- HENRY SMITHS CHARITY PARISH OF LITTLE BOOKHAM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Poulton | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pat Tilley | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £0 | £4.40k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £1.95k | £2.25k | £3.91k | £960 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REP VOL. 13 PP 475 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 14TH SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY,AFTER DEFRAYING THEREFROM THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDING THEREON) AND ALL OTHER CHARGESAND OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND ALL THE PROPER COSTS,CHARGES AND EXDPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY,FOR:(1)RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THIS SCHEME(2)SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THEINHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF LITTLE BOOKHAM AS THE TRUTEES THINK FIT
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF LITTLE BOOKHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKHURST
EDGELEY
BOOKHAM
LEATHERHEAD
KT23 3BE
- Phone:
- 01372454323
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window