Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH DIABETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 215199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window