Trustees THE BRITISH DIABETIC ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 215199

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sarah Neshat Ali | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carol Homden CBE | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gibbs | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Linda Caroline Bauld OBE | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Morton Lewis | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Asiya Yunus | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Stephenson Gray | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian James King | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mohamed Wasim Hanif | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janice Ann Watson | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary McCallum | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.