WIRRAL MENCAP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Outreach Service Run weekly Crossbow Club for adults Fund travel and incidental costs for annual week long holiday for Crossbow members Run two minibuses used by the Crossbow Club (also available for use by other groups) Hold members meetings Produce bi-monthly newsletter Fund annual Christmas party Run Gateway Active Award Project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 08 February 1963: Standard registration
- 04 December 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 December 2014: Funds transferred to 1153742 WIRRAL MENCAP
- WIRRAL SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.93k | £20.51k | £24.56k | £42.83k | £94.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.05k | £33.38k | £31.44k | £57.20k | £115.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 28 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 28 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 13 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 13 May 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 28 November 2012 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 1959 AS AMENDED 25/07/1964, AS AMENDED 27/11/1980, AS AMENDED 27/112003 AS AMENDED 27/06/2013
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WIRRAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window