JOHN LONGWILL'S AGRICULTURAL SCHEME

Charity number: 215278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £54.87k £52.10k £60.42k £52.56k £69.55k
Total expenditure £58.53k £62.09k £58.12k £38.25k £43.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A