Accounts and annual returns TRELEWIS O A P WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 215286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window