TRELEWIS O A P WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arrange various coach Outings to places of interest. Organise various social events eg. concerts, bingo social evenings, luncheon club, Christmas Dinner with entertainment. Provide transport via minibus to events. Organise short break holidays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Merthyr Tydfil
Governance
- 01 March 1963: Standard registration
- TRELEWIS OAP ASSOCIATION COMMITTEE (Working name)
- TRELEWIS OAP WELFARE COMMITTEE (Working name)
- TRELEWIS O A P BUILDING AND WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jillian Cowles | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Staples | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN LOVE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JUNE WHITCOMBE | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
IRFONA PRIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AUDREY ANNE WILTSHIRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.01k | £11.66k | £13.75k | £37.44k | £29.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.14k | £11.62k | £14.89k | £36.79k | £29.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION. AS AMENDED 7 MARCH 2003.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION, DEVELOPING PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHERING HEALTH, RELEIVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS, OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
TRELEWIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 ST. MARY STREET
TRELEWIS
TREHARRIS
CF46 6AL
- Phone:
- 01443411597
- Email:
- audreyanne16@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window