Accounts and annual returns THE BISHOP'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 215312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required