Financial history THE BISHOP'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 215312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £7.17k £7.22k £8.29k £8.46k £8.74k
Total expenditure £7.15k £3.68k £17.83k £2.74k £11.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A