Financial history BRITISH EMUNAH FUND

Charity number: 215398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.04m £1.03m £894.70k £1.38m £1.15m
Total expenditure £1.09m £1.09m £755.95k £838.36k £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £630.42k £446.63k £391.46k £1.05m £661.90k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £410.43k £583.02k £502.07k £328.55k £491.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £759 £781 £1.18k £586 £451
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £26.22k £32.06k £91.23k £346.79k £118.47k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £937.99k £885.34k £606.22k £738.61k £1.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £148.12k £201.95k £149.74k £99.75k £21.33k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £29.39k £7.08k £7.77k £7.34k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £522.26k £298.38k £384.95k £911.19k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0