MORDEN COLLEGE

Charity number: 215551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.20m £11.92m £13.41m £14.22m £15.95m
Total expenditure £13.95m £10.06m £11.45m £11.91m £13.35m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £14.00k £74.70k £13.86k £111.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.59m £3.83m £3.76m £4.17m £4.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.51m £7.89m £9.39m £9.91m £11.23m
Income - Other £98.00k £190.00k £188.30k £132.14k £292.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £61.82k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.43m £9.02m £9.49m £10.06m £11.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.42m £1.04m £1.96m £1.85m £2.19m
Expenditure - Governance £25.00k £22.00k £22.00k £25.00k £25.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £96.00k £99.00k £124.40k £127.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £1.42m £1.04m £949.00k £836.00k £1.04m
Expenditure - Other £3.10m £0 £0 £0 £0