BARRY AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 215607
Charity reporting is overdue by 1520 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011 30/09/2012
Total gross income £8.09k £6.66k £6.21k £10.94k £6.00k
Total expenditure £5.48k £5.11k £8.50k £12.93k £4.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A