FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 215618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 21 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 21 February 2020 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required