FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 215618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £4.93k £5.35k £4.80k £4.76k £5.53k
Total expenditure £5.10k £4.70k £5.30k £4.72k £5.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A