ELIZABETH HALL FOR WIDOWS

Charity number: 215636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.02k £21.33k £22.18k £22.89k £24.26k
Total expenditure £22.45k £11.99k £19.59k £29.59k £13.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A