QUEEN VICTORIA MEMORIAL HOME OF REST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making of grants within the City of Derby to people who are in need, hardship or distress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derby City
Governance
- 12 February 1963: Standard registration
- 08 April 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 April 2014: Funds transferred to 1155282 THE LIVERSAGE TRUST
- HOME OF REST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.83k | £27.18k | £29.16k | £37.65k | £35.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.50k | £16.83k | £9.04k | £24.56k | £15.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 02 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 02 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 25 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 25 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 09 February 2012 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 09 February 2012 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 24/06/1907 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/04/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/10/1988
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE NET INCOME OF THE QVH CHARITY’S PROPERTY AND ALL OR ANY PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE QVH CHARITY’S PROPERTY AT THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES TO SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING): • TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE AGED SICK OR INFIRM OR IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS • TO PROVIDE HOUSING AND ACCOMMODATION AND CARE FOR PERSONS WHO ARE AGED SICK OR INFIRM OR IN CONDITION OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
FORMER COUNTY BOROUGH OF DERBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window