Financial history CHARITY OF WILLIAM AYLETT (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity number: 215855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £783 £804 £849 £816 £822
Total expenditure £600 £1.00k £600 £600 £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A