DR BROMLEYS CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There have been no disbursements from the charity since 1998 when the accumulated income at that time was distributed to St Leonards Jnr School as a contribution to the provision of a nursery school. During the year, the Trustees passed a resolution under S74 of the Charities Act 1993, to transfer the assets of the charity to the James Blackburn Legacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 September 1963: Standard registration
- 01 September 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 01 September 2008: Funds transferred to 215798 PADIHAM TOWN COUNCIL CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37 | £49 | £53 | £60 | £69 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 04 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 28 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 February 2007 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 February 2006 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 March 2005 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 13TH JAN. 1931
Charitable objects
ENTERTAINMENT OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN OR OLD PEOPLE OF PADIHAM.
Area of benefit
PADIHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window