FRIENDS OF HAREFIELD HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To mobilise, encourage, foster and maintain the interest of the public and the patients and support of the work of the Harefield Hospital by means of voluntary service. The charity provides a service to patients, staff and visitors by way of a Refreshment Pavilion and small shop, and to support the Hospital by financing selective projects for which the Hospital Trust has insufficient resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 25 March 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Patricia Crawford | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Mary Marks | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Rossouw | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kath Phipps | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAY ANDREWS | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALICE JUDITH SNOOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.54k | £36.14k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.63k | £39.42k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 June 2024 | 878 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED OCTOBER 1961
Charitable objects
TO MOBILISE, ENCOURAGE, FOSTER AND MAINTAIN THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PATIENTS AND SUPPORT OF THE WORK OF THE HAREFIELD HOSPITAL BY MEANS OF VOLUNTARY SERVICE.
Area of benefit
HAREFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAREFIELD HOSPITAL
HILL END ROAD
HAREFIELD
UXBRIDGE
UB9 6JH
- Phone:
- 01895828678
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window